This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2020 at 11:38:11 (UTC).

CT CALABASAS LLC VS INTERNATIONAL LASER GROUP INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 CT CALABASAS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INTERNATIONAL LASER GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7374

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CT CALABASAS LLC

Respondents and Defendants

INTERNATIONAL LASER GROUP INC.

DOES 1-100

TURBAN USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL D. ZEFF

ZEFF MICHAEL D

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

ZEFF MICHAEL DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

AKLEY BENJAMIN S

AKLEY BENJAMIN S.

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

9/9/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

9/11/2019: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Default Judgment

8/27/2019: Default Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

9/3/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

8/27/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Judgment

8/27/2019: Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND ...)

8/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND ...)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/9/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

7/9/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/9/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND ...)

6/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND ...)

Proof of Personal Service

2/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/13/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND ...)

3/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND ...)

Notice - Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/9/2019: Notice - Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

1/10/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

10/29/2018: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge) of 10/30/2018

10/30/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge) of 10/30/2018

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by CT Calabasas, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by CT Calabasas, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by CT Calabasas, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by CT Calabasas, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by CT Calabasas, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CT Calabasas, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2018
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge) of 10/30/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Turban USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CT Calabasas, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CT Calabasas, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CT Calabasas, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7374    Hearing Date: January 29, 2021    Dept: 31

MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.

Background

On August 10, 2018, Plaintiff CT Calabasas, LLC filed the instant action against Defendants International Laser Group, Inc., Turban USA, Inc., and Does 1 to 100. The Complaint asserts causes of action for:

  1. Breach of Contract; and

  2. Common Counts.

    On November 9, 2018, Default was entered as to Defendant International Laser Group, Inc. On August 27, 2019, the Court granted Plaintiff’s request for default judgment against Defendant International Laser Group, Inc. (hereinafter “Defendant”) in the amount of $348,750.31.

    Plaintiff now moves for an order amending the judgment entered on August 27, 2019 to change Defendant’s name to Agoura Hills Group, formerly known as International Laser Group, Inc.

    Legal Standard

    “‘As a general rule, “a court may amend its judgment at any time so that the judgment will properly designate the real defendants.” (Carolina Casualty Ins. Co. v. L.M. Ross Law Group, LLP (2012) 212 Cal.App.4th 1181, 1188.) In order to see that justice is done, great liberality is encouraged in the allowance of amendments brought pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 187. (Greenspan v. LADT LLC (2010) 191 Cal.App.4th 486, 508; Misik v. D'Arco (2011) 197 Cal.App.4th 1065, 1074-1075.)

    Judgments may be amended where “the new corporation is, in reality, but a continuation of the old.” (McClellan v. Northridge Park Townhome Owners Ass’n, Inc. (2001) 89 Cal.App.4th 746, 756.)

    Discussion

    Plaintiff moves for an order amending the judgment entered on August 27, 2019 to change Defendant’s name to Agoura Hills Group, formerly known as International Laser Group, Inc. Plaintiff asserts that in June 2020, counsel for Plaintiff commenced efforts to assist in executing the Judgment and discovered that on or about August 29, 2018, several weeks after this action was filed, Defendant filed a “Certificate of Amendment of Articles of Incorporation Name Change Only – Stock” with the California Secretary of State, changing its corporate name to “Agoura Hills Group.” (Zeff Decl. ¶ 7, Exh. 3.) Plaintiff contends that amending the judgment as requested will in no way prejudice Defendant in that per its corporate filings, “International Laser Group, Inc.” and “Agoura Hills Group” are the same legal entity. Plaintiff argues that in contrast, if this motion is denied, Plaintiff will effectively be barred from ever executing its judgment to its substantial prejudice and harm, as it is extremely unlikely that any of Defendant’s assets remain in the name “International Laser Group, Inc.”

    The Court finds that Plaintiff has established an entitlement to the relief sought. The evidence provided by Plaintiff sufficiently demonstrates that Agoura Hills Group is but a continuation of Defendant, as indicated by the Certificate of Amendment of Articles of Incorporation Name Change Only – Stock.

    Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff’s unopposed motion to amend judgment is GRANTED.

    Conclusion

    Plaintiff’s unopposed motion to amend judgment is GRANTED.

The parties are strongly encouraged to attend all scheduled hearings virtually or by audio. Effective July 20, 2020, all matters will be scheduled virtually and/or with audio through the Court’s LACourtConnect technology. The parties are strongly encouraged to use LACourtConnect for all their matters. All social distancing protocols will be observed at the Courthouse and in the courtrooms.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CT CALABASAS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERNATIONAL LASER GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.