This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 09:47:01 (UTC).

CT CALABASAS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS TOL, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 CT CALABASAS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOL, INC , A NEVADA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8164

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

CT CALABASAS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

TOL INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION DBA T.O. LIFE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CARVALHO ARTHUR JR.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/14/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

7/29/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/29/2021: Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement

8/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/25/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES TOL, INC.

10/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES TOL, INC.

Case Management Statement

10/1/2021: Case Management Statement

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (TOL, Inc.); Filed by TOL, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by TOL, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by CT CALABASAS LLC, A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CT CALABASAS LLC, A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by CT CALABASAS LLC, A Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TOL, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by TOL, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CT CALABASAS LLC, A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CT CALABASAS LLC, A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CT CALABASAS LLC, A Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CT CALABASAS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.