Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 12:36:06 (UTC).

CRYSTAL MARTIN VS ESSEX PORTFOLIO, L.P., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 CRYSTAL MARTIN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ESSEX PORTFOLIO, L P . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2965

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIN CRYSTAL

Defendants

ESSEX PORTFOLIO L.P.

REDWOOD URBAN LLC

REDWOOD HIGHLAND GP LLC

ESSEX PROPERTY TRUST INC.

RWBP HIGHLAND L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

4/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Notice of Ruling

4/22/2021: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

4/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESSES

4/6/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESSES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 03/10/2021

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 03/10/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

2/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

1/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

1/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/22/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/22/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/22/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/12/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/12/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

11/9/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • Hearing06/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Essex Portfolio, L.P. (Defendant); Essex Property Trust, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Essex Portfolio, L.P. (Defendant); Essex Property Trust, Inc. (Defendant); Redwood Highland GP, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (JOINT STIPULATION RE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESSES); Filed by Essex Portfolio, L.P. (Defendant); Essex Property Trust, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Crystal Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Crystal Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Crystal Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt); Filed by Crystal Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt); Filed by Crystal Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Crystal Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Crystal Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Crystal Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Crystal Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDWOOD URBAN LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ESSEX PORTFOLIO L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where ESSEX PROPERTY TRUST INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant