This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2023 at 11:56:20 (UTC).

CRYSTAL HADDAD VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 CRYSTAL HADDAD filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3696

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HADDAD CRYSTAL

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOLONZ ADAM MARTIN

Defendant Attorney

HAIRAPETIAN ARMEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/21/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/21/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/21/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/21/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/21/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/21/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/22/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/29/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2023
  • Hearing08/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Crystal Haddad (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Crystal Haddad (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 02/27/2023; Service Cost: 171.45; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketAddress for Adam Martin Zolonz (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Crystal Haddad (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Crystal Haddad (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Crystal Haddad (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara A. Meiers in Department 12 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less