This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2021 at 13:11:32 (UTC).

CRYSTAL DESIREE ROBERTS VS CYLINDER ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 CRYSTAL DESIREE ROBERTS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CYLINDER ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9676

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTS CRYSTAL DESIREE

Defendant

CYLINDER ENTERPRISES INC. DBA FINISH LINE TOWING AND TRANSPORT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGERS ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

GIAMELA LONNIE D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

7/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

6/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/14/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice of Ruling

6/21/2021: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

5/13/2021: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/13/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/13/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/15/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/16/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

11/18/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/15/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/21/2021

Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021

Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021

DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by CRYSTAL DESIREE ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021

DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Robert Rogers (Attorney)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021

DocketProof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Robert Rogers (Attorney)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021

DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Robert Rogers (Attorney)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021

DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Robert Rogers (Attorney)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
03/02/2021

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CRYSTAL DESIREE ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2021

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by CRYSTAL DESIREE ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2020

DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by CRYSTAL DESIREE ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020

DocketAnswer; Filed by CYLINDER ENTERPRISES, INC. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2020

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by CRYSTAL DESIREE ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2020

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2020

DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CRYSTAL DESIREE ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2020

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CRYSTAL DESIREE ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2020

DocketComplaint; Filed by CRYSTAL DESIREE ROBERTS (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less