This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 18:20:20 (UTC).

CRYSTAL ANDERSON VS MARTIN LUTHER KING HOSPITAL COMMUNITY

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 CRYSTAL ANDERSON filed an Other lawsuit against MARTIN LUTHER KING HOSPITAL COMMUNITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL E. WHITAKER, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2304

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON CRYSTAL

Defendant

MARTIN LUTHER KING HOSPITAL COMMUNITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DRAGOJEVIC JULIA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

1/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT) OF 01/19/2021

1/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT) OF 01/19/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)

Notice of Ruling

1/21/2021: Notice of Ruling

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/17/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ORDER STRIKING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 03/18/2021, ORDER

3/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ORDER STRIKING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 03/18/2021, ORDER

Order - ORDER STRIKING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

3/18/2021: Order - ORDER STRIKING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER STRIKING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

3/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER STRIKING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER STRIKING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

3/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER STRIKING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Other - - OTHER - NOTICE OF REJECTION-FORM WG-001

5/5/2021: Other - - OTHER - NOTICE OF REJECTION-FORM WG-001

Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF HEARING ON DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT, MARTIN LUTHER KING, JR. COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

12/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF HEARING ON DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT, MARTIN LUTHER KING, JR. COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Other - - RAP CASE EXHIBITS

10/29/2020: Other - - RAP CASE EXHIBITS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...) OF 10/26/2020

10/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...) OF 10/26/2020

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

10/16/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

PI General Order

9/17/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

9/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2023
  • Hearing08/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Hearing02/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketOther - (Notice of Rejection-Form WG-001); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order Striking Peremptory Challenge); Filed by Martin Luther King Hospital Community (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 11:40 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOrder (Striking Peremptory Challenge); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Order Striking Peremptory Challenge) of 03/18/2021, Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Order Striking Peremptory Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Crystal Anderson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (...) of 10/26/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Martin Luther King Hospital Community (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Crystal Anderson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Crystal Anderson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTIN LUTHER KING JR. COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DRAGOJEVIC, JULIA