Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2021 at 09:19:42 (UTC).

CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY VS JOSE PADRON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against JOSE PADRON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5418

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

PADRON RAHYNE

PADRON JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DORENFELD DAVID KEITH

DORENFELD DAVID K.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

4/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/23/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Crusader Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DORENFELD DAVID K.