Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 01:52:12 (UTC).

CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION VS NIKOLAY MACHEVSKY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against NIKOLAY MACHEVSKY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3524

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

Defendants

MACHEVSKY NIKOLAY

KLEEMOFF MICHAEL

KLEEMOFF IZABELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBAUM MARK J

Defendant Attorney

SKLAR JULIA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/12/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/9/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Related Case

3/5/2019: Notice of Related Case

Case Management Statement

3/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/19/2019: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/4/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/26/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Personal Service

12/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lis Pendens

12/27/2018: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice

12/20/2018: Notice

Unknown

11/2/2018: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/2/2018: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Status Conference (ReRuling on Notice of Related Case) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Crown Towers Homeowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Nikolay Machevsky (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Crown Towers Homeowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Crown Towers Homeowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Crown Towers Homeowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • Notice of Pendency of Action; Filed by Crown Towers Homeowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Notice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Crown Towers Homeowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Nikolay Machevsky (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Crown Towers Homeowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Crown Towers Homeowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Crown Towers Homeowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBAUM MARK J.