Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 09:21:26 (UTC).

CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC VS IZABELLE KLEEMOFF ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/10/2017 CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOC filed an Other lawsuit against IZABELLE KLEEMOFF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH R. KALIN and MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7138

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH R. KALIN

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 5

KLEEMOFF NIKOLAY

KLEEMOFF IZABELLA

MACHEVSKY NIKOLAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSENBAUM MARK J. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SKLAR JULIA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/6/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

2/6/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

4/23/2018: MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

8/20/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

9/4/2018: MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

Unknown

1/11/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/11/2018: Unknown

COMPLAINT: (1) TO FORECLOSE LIEN; (2) FOR BREACH OF COVENANTS; (3) QUANTUM MERUIT; AND (4) ACCOUNT STATED

4/7/2017: COMPLAINT: (1) TO FORECLOSE LIEN; (2) FOR BREACH OF COVENANTS; (3) QUANTUM MERUIT; AND (4) ACCOUNT STATED

Unknown

4/26/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/26/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/16/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

6/1/2017: Unknown

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/7/2017: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

6/13/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/29/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/11/2017: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/7/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Nikolay Machevsky (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • THE MEMORANDUM OF COSTS SUBMITTED IN THE ABOVE ENTITRED ACTION HAS BEEN REJECTED FOR THE REASON(S) CHECKED BELOW:7 JUDGMENT HAS NOT BEEN FILED/ENTERED AS OF THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 74; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Crown Towers Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Crown Towers Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Crown Towers Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • COMPLAINT: (1) TO FORECLOSE LIEN; (2) FOR BREACH OF COVENANTS; (3) QUANTUM MERUIT; AND (4) ACCOUNT STATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBAUM MARK J.