This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2020 at 15:06:58 (UTC).

CROWN ENERGY SERVICES, INC. VS SHANAI LILA MCZEAL-SMALL

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 CROWN ENERGY SERVICES, INC filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHANAI LILA MCZEAL-SMALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9475

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ENERGY SERVICES INC.

Defendant

MCZEAL-SMALL SHANAI LILA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAYNE ERIC JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/28/2020: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CROWN ENERGY SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CROWN ENERGY SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CROWN ENERGY SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CROWN ENERGY SERVICES, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN ENERGY SERVICES INC. DBA ABLE ENGINEERING SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAYNE ERIC JEFFREY