This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2023 at 15:03:48 (UTC).

CROSSROADS EQUIPMENT LEASE AND FINANCE, LLC VS LITTLE FAT TRUCKING, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 CROSSROADS EQUIPMENT LEASE AND FINANCE, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LITTLE FAT TRUCKING, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0094

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROSSROADS EQUIPMENT LEASE AND FINANCE LLC

Defendants

LITTLE FAT TRUCKING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WANG AN INDIVIDUAL XING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KHATCHADOURIAN RAFFI

 

Court Documents

Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION (CLAIM AND DELIVERY) (ORANGE CO)

3/16/2023: Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION (CLAIM AND DELIVERY) (ORANGE CO)

Writ of - WRIT OF WRIT OF POSSESSION (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

3/14/2023: Writ of - WRIT OF WRIT OF POSSESSION (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

3/7/2023: Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

2/15/2023: Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

2/1/2023: Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER

Notice of Ruling

1/30/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (CCP 512.010);)

1/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (CCP 512.010);)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL COHEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

1/26/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL COHEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

1/26/2023: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

1/26/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAFFI KHATCHADOURIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

1/26/2023: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

Declaration for Ex Parte Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

1/26/2023: Declaration for Ex Parte Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

1/26/2023: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

1/26/2023: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Claim and Delivery)

1/26/2023: Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Claim and Delivery)

Proof of Service by Mail

1/26/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department L at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) (Los Angeles Co.): Name Extension changed from Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery) to Possession (Claim and Delivery) (Los Angeles Co.) ; As To Parties changed from Xing Wang, an individual (Defendant), Little Fat Trucking, a California corporation (Defendant) to Xing Wang, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketWrit of Possession (Claim and Delivery) (Orange Co); Issued by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Xing Wang, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketWrit of Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Issued by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Little Fat Trucking, a California corporation (Defendant); Xing Wang, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Proposed Order: Status Date changed from 03/07/2023 to 03/07/2023 ; Result Date changed from 03/07/2023 to 03/07/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Xing Wang, an individual (Defendant), Little Fat Trucking, a California corporation (Defendant) to Xing Wang, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketEx Parte Proposed Order; Signed and Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Little Fat Trucking, a California corporation (Defendant); Xing Wang, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Proposed Order: Filed By: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department L - Hon. Wesley L. Hsueffective 03/02/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); Little Fat Trucking, a California corporation (Defendant); Xing Wang, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Little Fat Trucking, a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 01/13/2023; Service Cost: 236.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department L Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Little Fat Trucking, a California corporation (Defendant); Xing Wang, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Little Fat Trucking, a California corporation (Defendant); Xing Wang, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Little Fat Trucking, a California corporation (Defendant); Xing Wang, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less