This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2023 at 03:45:43 (UTC).

CROSSROADS EQUIPMENT LEASE AND FINANCE, LLC VS ABOYAN BROTHERS TRUCKING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 CROSSROADS EQUIPMENT LEASE AND FINANCE, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ABOYAN BROTHERS TRUCKING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1040

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROSSROADS EQUIPMENT LEASE AND FINANCE LLC

Defendants

ABOYAN AN INDIVIDUAL ARUTYUN

ABOYAN BROTHERS TRUCKING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KHATCHADOURIAN RAFFI

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/18/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/18/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL

1/19/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/9/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • Hearing04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aboyan Brothers Trucking, Inc., a California corporation; (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to Aboyan Brothers Trucking, Inc., a California corporation;; On the Complaint filed by Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC on 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketAddress for Raffi Khatchadourian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC on 11/18/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC as to Arutyun Aboyan, an individual

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aboyan Brothers Trucking, Inc., a California corporation; (Defendant); Arutyun Aboyan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal - Partial: Filed By: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Name Extension: - Partial ; Result Date: 01/19/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Arutyun Aboyan, an individual (Defendant), Aboyan Brothers Trucking, Inc., a California corporation; (Defendant) to Arutyun Aboyan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Arutyun Aboyan, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/30/2022; Service Cost: 125.83; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aboyan Brothers Trucking, Inc., a California corporation; (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/30/2022; Service Cost: 72.83; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank M. Tavelman in Department A Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aboyan Brothers Trucking, Inc., a California corporation; (Defendant); Arutyun Aboyan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aboyan Brothers Trucking, Inc., a California corporation; (Defendant); Arutyun Aboyan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Crossroads Equipment Lease and Finance, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Aboyan Brothers Trucking, Inc., a California corporation; (Defendant); Arutyun Aboyan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less