Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 04:58:42 (UTC).

CRISTINA VALENCIA, ET AL. VS GUADALUPE BOJORQUEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 CRISTINA VALENCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GUADALUPE BOJORQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8399

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VALENCIA CRISTINA

VALENCIA ARMANDO

Defendants

ULS EXPRESS INC.

BOJORQUEZ GUADALUPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYES BRADLEY G

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/28/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/17/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2024
  • Hearing05/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cristina Valencia (Plaintiff); Armando Valencia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cristina Valencia (Plaintiff); Armando Valencia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cristina Valencia (Plaintiff); Armando Valencia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ULS EXPRESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES BRADLEY G