This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 09:12:48 (UTC).

CRISTINA BERNAL, AN INDIVIDUAL VS HAYWARD POOL PRODUCTS, INC., A SURRENDERED NEW JERSEY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 CRISTINA BERNAL, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HAYWARD POOL PRODUCTS, INC , A SURRENDERED NEW JERSEY CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2192

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERNAL CRISTINA

Defendants

HAYWARD INDUSTRIES INC. WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS HAYWARD MANUFACTURING CO. INC.

HAYWARD POOL PRODUCTS INC.

KAMRAN STAFFING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AVILES DIEGO F.

BIBIYAN DAVID D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/17/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/15/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/29/2021

11/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/29/2021

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

11/29/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/17/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docketat 3:43 PM in Department 56; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by CRISTINA BERNAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CRISTINA BERNAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CRISTINA BERNAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CRISTINA BERNAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hayward Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HAYWARD POOL PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KAMRAN STAFFING, INC., A CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aviles, Diego