Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 04:10:51 (UTC).

CRISTIAN TEODOR IONESCU VS CARLOS ALBERTO LARA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 CRISTIAN TEODOR IONESCU filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARLOS ALBERTO LARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3010

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

IONESCU CRISTIAN TEODOR

Defendants and Respondents

RECINO RENE

ARENEROS TRUCKING INC.

LARA CARLOS ALBERTO

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

ROADRUNNER TRUCKING LLC DOE1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SOOFER LAW GROUP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CULLINS & GRNADY LLP

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS RENE RECINO AND ARENEROS TRUCKING INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/9/2018: DEFENDANTS RENE RECINO AND ARENEROS TRUCKING INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE

11/13/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS

11/13/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT CARLOS ALBERTO LARA'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/26/2018: DEFENDANT CARLOS ALBERTO LARA'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/19/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

12/28/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

2/22/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

2/8/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Unknown

1/9/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

5/2/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Rene Recino (Defendant); Areneros Trucking Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Carlos Alberto Lara (Defendant); Rene Recino (Defendant); Areneros Trucking Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Rene Recino (Defendant); Areneros Trucking Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cristian Teodor Ionescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cristian Teodor Ionescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cristian Teodor Ionescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Cristian Teodor Ionescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Cristian Teodor Ionescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less