This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 01:01:28 (UTC).

CRISTIAN GONZALEZ ET AL VS PRIVANKA PUSHPACK KEHELGAMUA ET A

Case Summary

On 05/25/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by CRISTIAN GONZALEZ against PRIVANKA PUSHPACK KEHELGAMUA ET A in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7941

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ VICTOR

RAMIREZ JESSICA

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ZEPEDA SINDY

GONZALEZ CRISTIAN

RAMIREZ JESSICA

Defendants and Respondents

HENGEHOLD MTR CO

BENAKA GOURMET LLC

HENGEHOLD TRUCKS

Respondents

KEHELGAMUA PRIVANKA PUSHPACK

BENAKA GOURMET LLC

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

6/19/2019: Proof of Personal Service

SUMMONS

5/25/2018: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE, NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT, NEGLIGENT HIRING, NEGLIGENT UNDERTAKING, NEGLIGENT RETENTION, NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION AND NEGLIGENT TRAINING; A

5/25/2018: PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE, NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT, NEGLIGENT HIRING, NEGLIGENT UNDERTAKING, NEGLIGENT RETENTION, NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION AND NEGLIGENT TRAINING; A

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Cristian Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Jessica Ramirez (Plaintiff); Sindy Zepeda (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Cristian Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Jessica Ramirez (Plaintiff); Sindy Zepeda (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE, NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT, NEGLIGENT HIRING, NEGLIGENT UNDERTAKING, NEGLIGENT RETENTION, NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION AND NEGLIGENT TRAINING; AND ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC707941    Hearing Date: November 12, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

CRISTIAN GONZALEZ, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

PRIVANKA PUSHPACK KEHELGAMUA, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC707941

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION TO SANTA CLARA COUNTY

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 12, 2019

Plaintiffs, Cristian Gonzalez, Jessica Ramirez, Sindy Zepeda, and Victor Gonzalez filed this action against Defendants, Privanka Pushpack Kehelgamua, Hengehold Mtr. Co., Hengehold Trucks, Benaka Groumet, LLC, and Nair Reshmi for damages arising out of an automobile accident. Plaintiff’s complaint alleges the accident took place in Los Angeles County.

Defendant, Hengehold moves to transfer venue to Santa Clara County, contending the accident took place in San Francisco County, three of the defendants reside in Santa Clara County, and no defendant resides in Los Angeles. Per CCP §395, an action for damages arising out of personal injuries must be filed in the county where the accident took place or in the county where one or more defendants resides. Defendant provides evidence, by way of the Declaration of Gupta, that the accident occurred in San Francisco County, it resides in Santa Clara County, and no defendant resides in Los Angeles County.

Any opposition to the motion was due on or before 10/29/19. The Court has not received any opposition to the motion. The motion to transfer is therefore granted. The action is transferred from Los Angeles County to Santa Clara County.

CCP §399(a) obligates the plaintiff to pay the fees if the motion is granted on the “wrong court” ground. Plaintiff is responsible for paying the costs and fees of transferring the action to Santa Clara County within thirty days after service of notice of the transfer order. If Plaintiff fails to do so within five days after service of notice of the order, any other interested party, whether named in the complaint or not, may pay such costs and fees in order to expedite the transfer. If the fees and costs are not paid within thirty days, the action is subject to dismissal. CCP §399(a); see Stasz v. Eisenberg (2010) 190 Cal.App.4th 1032, 1037.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.