Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 09:03:24 (UTC).

CRIS DENHAM VS HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 CRIS DENHAM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6362

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENHAM CRIS

Defendant

HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOLIN TIONNA

DOLIN TIONNA GRACE

Defendant Attorney

PARK JIMMY Y.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

3/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

12/9/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

12/9/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/8/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Case Management Statement

11/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/5/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

10/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Informal Discovery Conference

10/2/2020: Informal Discovery Conference

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

8/21/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Answer

6/16/2020: Answer

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/17/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

6/18/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

6/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

5/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • Hearing01/18/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Hearing01/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Cris Denham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Cris Denham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Cris Denham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice (JOINT STATEMENT OF DISPUTE IN ADVANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE); Filed by Hyundai Motor America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: peremptory challenge to judicial officer;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Hyundai Motor America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hyundai Motor America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cris Denham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cris Denham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cris Denham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cris Denham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLIN TIONNA