This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 05:33:38 (UTC).

CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION INC VS REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC E

Case Summary

On 02/28/2017 CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2143

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

MEK ACQUISITIONS LLC

DOES 1 TO 50

REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC

WALKER HAROLD

Cross Defendants

ROJAS JUAN RAMON

JUAN RAMON ROJAS AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROJAS

ROJAS JUAN JOSE

ROJAS OLGA GRISELDA FKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

POLLARD RALPH L. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

ANDERSON MCPHARLIN & CONNERS LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/27/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF RECORDATION IN LOS ANGELES AND RIVERSIDE COUNTIES OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

3/28/2018: NOTICE OF RECORDATION IN LOS ANGELES AND RIVERSIDE COUNTIES OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, QUIET TITLE

2/28/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS

2/28/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/8/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/8/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

VERIFICATION FOR COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, QUIET TITLE

4/3/2017: VERIFICATION FOR COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, QUIET TITLE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/28/2017: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MEK ACQUISITIONS, LLC FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

4/28/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MEK ACQUISITIONS, LLC FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

Minute Order

4/28/2017: Minute Order

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS REHABBERS FINANCIAL, INC. AND MEK ACQUISITIONS, LLC TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4/28/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS REHABBERS FINANCIAL, INC. AND MEK ACQUISITIONS, LLC TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RECORDATION IN LOS ANGELES AND RIVERSIDE COUNTIES OF NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

5/5/2017: NOTICE OF RECORDATION IN LOS ANGELES AND RIVERSIDE COUNTIES OF NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

Unknown

5/15/2017: Unknown

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 40; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Status Conference (Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Mek Acquisitions, LLC (Legacy Party); Rehabbers Financial, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF RECORDATION IN LOS ANGELES AND RIVERSIDE COUNTIES OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Mek Acquisitions, LLC (Legacy Party); Rehabbers Financial, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Creditors Trade Association, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Default Entered; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Creditors Trade Association, Inc (Plaintiff); Rehabbers Financial, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Creditors Trade Association, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDITORS TRADE ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MEK ACQUISITIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant