This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2020 at 09:12:59 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. VS SHOWFX, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHOWFX, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0344

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendant

SHOWFX INC. AKA SHOWFX INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREED KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

4/1/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

4/3/2020: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Proof of Personal Service

10/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF DAVID MENDOZA, CEO & PRESIDENT FOR SHOWFX)

9/23/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF DAVID MENDOZA, CEO & PRESIDENT FOR SHOWFX)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

9/12/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

8/12/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

8/13/2019: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT

7/23/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT

Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments

7/11/2019: Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/11/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/15/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KENNETH J. FREED RE METHOD OF CALCULATING INTEREST

7/15/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KENNETH J. FREED RE METHOD OF CALCULATING INTEREST

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/1/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/3/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Complaint

4/22/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/22/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination (of David Mendoza, CEO & President for Showfx)); Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Kenneth J. Freed Re Method of Calculating Interest); Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHOWFX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant