This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2022 at 15:13:46 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC . VS PRIVATE HEALTH MANAGEMENT, INC .

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRIVATE HEALTH MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1608

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendant

PRIVATE HEALTH MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREED KENNETH JAY

Defendant Attorney

YOO TIMOTHY B.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

10/10/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY MONET...)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY MONET...)

Case Management Statement

9/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

8/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

Case Management Statement

7/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Continuance

6/8/2022: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/21/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

2/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/22/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2023
  • Hearing10/02/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Minute Order; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Private Health Management, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: ADR and Discovery scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/02/2023 at 09:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketJury Trial (5 days) scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Why Monet...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O updated: Result Date to 10/07/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Monetary Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed On Defense Counsel For The Failure To Appear On 08/05/2022 scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O updated: Result Date to 10/07/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC . (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 03/15/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. H. Jay Ford III in Department O Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC . (Plaintiff); As to: PRIVATE HEALTH MANAGEMENT, INC . (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC . (Plaintiff); As to: PRIVATE HEALTH MANAGEMENT, INC . (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC . (Plaintiff); As to: PRIVATE HEALTH MANAGEMENT, INC . (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOO TIMOTHY B.