This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 22:27:29 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., VS PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTORS, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC , filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTORS, A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0617

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTION LLC AKA PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTION INC

PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTORS A CORPORATION AKA PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTORS INC AKA PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUN ERIC J

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/2/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

3/8/2023: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/8/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2023
  • Hearing09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • Hearing09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTORS, A CORPORATION (Defendant); PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTION LLC (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTORS, A CORPORATION (Defendant); PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTION LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTORS, A CORPORATION (Defendant); PACIFIC WEST DISTRIBUTION LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less