This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 08:54:29 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. VS. MODA TRANSPORATION LLC

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MODA TRANSPORATION LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1603

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

MODA TRANSPORATION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNETH J. FREED LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2018
  • Judgment (SIGNED AND FILED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other (ASSIGNMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Declaration (PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF KENNETH J. FREED RE METHOD OF CALCULATING INTEREST ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Declaration (DECLARATION PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 585(D) AND ASSIGNMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE, ONLY. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Notice (PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Default Entered (AS TO DEFT., MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Proof of Service (OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less