This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 02:35:08 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. VS K7 DESIGN GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against K7 DESIGN GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0350

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendant

K7 DESIGN GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FREED KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

7/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

7/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/22/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

9/14/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

9/13/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/03/2022

1/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/03/2022

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

1/3/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • Docketat 12:53 PM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Docketat 12:53 PM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/03/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF DISMISSAL); Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/03/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF DISMISSAL); Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K7 Design Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant