This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 08:33:00 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. VS GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY INC.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0649

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendant

GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY INC. AKA GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY A CORPORATION AKA GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY AKA GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY INC. AND INVESTIGATION AKA GLOBAL FORCE PROTECTIVE SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREED KENNETH

Defendant Attorney

REYNOLDS JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/18/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/16/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/6/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

11/9/2020: Answer

Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT

2/2/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT

Request for Dismissal

2/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

Writ - Return

3/18/2022: Writ - Return

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

7/27/2021: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

7/27/2021: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Filed By: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 03/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied); CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY INC. (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Judgment: Filed By: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. against Defendant GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY INC. AKA GLOBAL FORCE PROTECTIVE SERVICES INC, AKA GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY, AKA GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY (A CORPORATION), AKA GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY INC. AND INVESTIGATION on the Complaint filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. on 09/16/2020 for damages of $232,479.72, attorney fees of $1,200.00, interest of $18,899.06, and costs of $521.15 for a total of $253,099.93.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/03/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. on 09/16/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., does 1-10 Inclusive, only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/07/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/30/2020; Service Cost: 72.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: GLOBAL FORCE SECURITY INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less