This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2023 at 09:58:25 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. VS BUDEE INC

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BUDEE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0399

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendant

BUDEE INC AKA BUDEE INC. AKA BUDEE INC. DBA GANJARUNNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREED KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/17/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/3/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2023
  • Hearing11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Budee Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to Budee Inc; On the Complaint filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. on 03/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Budee Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to Budee Inc; On the Complaint filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. on 03/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Clerical Correction ; Result Date: 05/03/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Budee Inc (Defendant) to Budee Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Proof of Personal Service: As To Parties changed from Budee Inc (Defendant) to Budee Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Budee Inc (Defendant); Service Date: 03/29/2023; Service Cost: 105.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Budee Inc (Defendant); Service Date: 03/29/2023; Service Cost: 105.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael Shultz in Department A Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Budee Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Budee Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Budee Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less