This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 22:43:13 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., VS BENCHMARK POST, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BENCHMARK POST, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2440

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendants

BENCHMARK POST INC.

BENCHMARK SOUND SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JYOO JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • Hearing02/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JYOO JOSEPH