This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2018 at 02:34:54 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. VS. 1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN and BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7281

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendants

GOLDEN CROSS HEALTH CARE

1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREED KENNETH J. LAW OFFICE OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • Stipulation and Order (for DISMISSAL PER CCP 664.6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department NCBB, Benny C. Osorio, Presiding; Case Ordered Reassigned - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department NCBB, Donna Fields Goldstein, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Notice (OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Notice (AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn.; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Proof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn.; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1450 NORTH FAIR OAKS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABIITY COMPANY DBA GOLDEN CROS HEALTH CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREED KENNETH JAY