This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2019 at 16:57:45 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJ BUREAU INC VS AZI ENTERTAINMENT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 CREDITORS ADJ BUREAU INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AZI ENTERTAINMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9163

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

CREDITOR'S ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC

CREDITOR'S ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC .

Defendants and Respondents

AZI ENTERTAINMENT INC

CRAZY HORSE

EF5 ACQUISITIONS GROUP LLC

DOES 1 TO 10

BAYGIRLS

DEJU VU TORRANCE

TORRANCE DEJU VU

HORSE CRAZY

AZI ENTERTAINMENT INC. DBA CRAZY HORSE

EF5 ACQUISITIONS GROUP LLC AKA EF5 AQUISITIONS GROUP LLC DBA DEJU VU TORRANCE ADBA BAYGIRLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

FREED KENNETH J. ESQ.

FREED KENNETH JAY ESQ.

DIDAK MARK FREDERICK

Defendant Attorneys

WIECZOREK NICHOLAS MICHAEL

CHRESTIONSON KEITH IRVING

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

11/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED S COUNSEL

11/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED S COUNSEL

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

11/26/2019: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

Proof of Service by Mail

11/26/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

11/26/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

11/26/2019: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSELCIVIL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME)

12/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/27/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service by Mail

11/27/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

11/27/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Substitution of Attorney

9/13/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

9/13/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

1/3/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Order

1/3/2019: Case Management Order

Answer -

10/16/2018: Answer -

Case Management Statement

12/17/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/28/2018: Case Management Statement

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • Hearing01/27/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Hearing01/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Hearing01/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Hearing01/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order Shortening Time) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by AZI Entertainment, Inc. (Defendant); EF5 Acquisitions Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by AZI Entertainment, Inc. (Defendant); EF5 Acquisitions Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by AZI Entertainment, Inc. (Defendant); EF5 Acquisitions Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion (AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL); Filed by AZI Entertainment, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by Creditor's Adjustment Bureau, Inc . (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Creditor's Adjustment Bureau, Inc . (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Creditor's Adjustment Bureau, Inc . (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZI ENTERTAINMENT INC A CORPORATION DBA CRAZY HORSE is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIDAK MARK F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREED KENNETH JAY