This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2021 at 21:49:08 (UTC).

CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE, LLC, A GEORGIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS GUILLERMO GODINEZ

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE, LLC, A GEORGIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GUILLERMO GODINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0259

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

GODINEZ GUILLERMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAGOPIAN SHANT HAROUT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

4/1/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

4/1/2021: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Application for Writ of Possession

4/1/2021: Application for Writ of Possession

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Order for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

7/21/2021: Order for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Request for Dismissal

7/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION;)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION;)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketOrder for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE, LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE, LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (-Partial); Filed by CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE, LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Application for Writ of Possession) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Application for Writ of Possession;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE, LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE, LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE, LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030); Filed by CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE, LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE, LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE, LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE, LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDIT UNION LOAN SOURCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAGOPIAN SHANT HAROUT