Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2020 at 20:31:36 (UTC).

CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS NFGTV, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NFGTV, INC , A NEW YORK CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0326

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

EASTERN TV AN UNKNOWN FORM OF ENTITY

BARRAUD TOBIAS

NFGTV INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYNOLDS JEREMIAH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

3/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/27/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - NOTICE RE: COMPLAINT

2/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE RE: COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/28/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (Re: Complaint); Filed by CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYNOLDS JEREMIAH