Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:24:30 (UTC).

CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS EASY STREET PRODUCTIONS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EASY STREET PRODUCTIONS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4122

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

BOAL MARK

EASY STREET PRODUCTIONS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

EASY STREET PRODUCTIONS INC. DBA EASY STREET PRODUCTIONS AND ENTERTAINMENT INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DERIN GREG DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/8/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/18/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service by Mail

7/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

6/25/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY is a litigant