Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2021 at 17:16:16 (UTC).

CRE8 MBR LLC, A CALIF. LTD. LIABILITY CO. VS KOLLIDER INDUSTRIES LLC, A CALIF. LTD. LIABILITY. CO.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 CRE8 MBR LLC, A CALIF LTD LIABILITY CO filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against KOLLIDER INDUSTRIES LLC, A CALIF LTD LIABILITY CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0033

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRE8 MBR LLC A CALIF. LTD. LIABILITY CO.

Defendant

KOLLIDER INDUSTRIES LLC A CALIF. LTD. LIABILITY. CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK DENNIS P

Defendant Attorney

ALLEN ROTHSTEIN GLEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

3/25/2021: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR TRIAL SETTING)

4/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR TRIAL SETTING)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR TRIAL SETTING) OF 04/01/2021

4/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR TRIAL SETTING) OF 04/01/2021

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

2/26/2021: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/1/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Notice of Ruling

3/2/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY ANSWER SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN FOR...)

3/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY ANSWER SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN FOR...)

Answer

3/12/2021: Answer

Answer - ANSWER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER

1/26/2021: Answer - ANSWER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/15/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

1/20/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

1/14/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/14/2021: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • Hearing05/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Hearing05/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Hearing05/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 1:51 PM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Request for Trial Setting) of 04/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Request for Trial Setting)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRequest/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by CRE8 MBR LLC, A CALIF. LTD. LIABILITY CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRequest/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by CRE8 MBR LLC, A CALIF. LTD. LIABILITY CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer (- Unlawful Detainer); Filed by KOLLIDER INDUSTRIES LLC, A CALIF. LTD. LIABILITY. CO. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((KOLLIDER INDUSTRIES LLC, A CALIF. LTD. LIABILITY. CO.)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CRE8 MBR LLC, A CALIF. LTD. LIABILITY CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CRE8 MBR LLC, A CALIF. LTD. LIABILITY CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by CRE8 MBR LLC, A CALIF. LTD. LIABILITY CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CRE8 MBR LLC, A CALIF. LTD. LIABILITY CO. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.