This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 03:36:51 (UTC).

CRAIG TICEY, ET AL. VS PARKER HOTEL, L.P.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 CRAIG TICEY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PARKER HOTEL, L P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4048

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BURRELL ZEFRELLA

STALLWORTH CARLOS

TAYLOR LISA

TICEY CRAIG

WALKER ANGELO

Defendant

PARKER HOTEL L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIELSEN JONATHAN

Defendant Attorney

OLSON SONALI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/29/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

10/4/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

10/4/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Request for Judicial Notice

10/4/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Case Management Statement

10/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Craig Ticey (Plaintiff); Lisa Taylor (Plaintiff); Zefrella Burrell (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Craig Ticey (Plaintiff); Lisa Taylor (Plaintiff); Zefrella Burrell (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Parker Hotel, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Parker Hotel, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Parker Hotel, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Parker Hotel, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Parker Hotel, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Craig Ticey (Plaintiff); Lisa Taylor (Plaintiff); Zefrella Burrell (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Craig Ticey (Plaintiff); Lisa Taylor (Plaintiff); Zefrella Burrell (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Craig Ticey (Plaintiff); Lisa Taylor (Plaintiff); Zefrella Burrell (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLSON SONALI