Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2020 at 23:56:18 (UTC).

CRAIG SMITH, ET AL VS PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 CRAIG SMITH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9617

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH STEPHANIE

THE LOVELY SMITH FAMILY TRUST

SMITH CRAIG

Defendant

PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EILENBERG BEN A.

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

3/14/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE)

3/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

1/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/28/2019

1/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/28/2019

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/30/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

8/1/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

Complaint -

8/1/2018: Complaint -

Notice of Case Assignment -

8/1/2018: Notice of Case Assignment -

Summons -

8/1/2018: Summons -

Proof of Service by Substituted Service -

8/15/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service -

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/28/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by CRAIG SMITH (Plaintiff); STEPHANIE SMITH (Plaintiff); THE LOVELY SMITH FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketSummons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CRAIG SMITH (Plaintiff); STEPHANIE SMITH (Plaintiff); THE LOVELY SMITH FAMILY TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EILENBERG BEN A.