This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2021 at 15:46:21 (UTC).

CRAIG REED VS CALIFORNIA MARINE/COMMERCIAL INSULATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 CRAIG REED filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CALIFORNIA MARINE/COMMERCIAL INSULATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7011

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REED CRAIG

Defendants

CALIFORNIA MARINE/COMMERCIAL INSULATION

CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

SID E. PARKER BOILER MFG. COMPANY INC.

PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC.

HUNTINGTON INGALLS INCORPORATED

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

FRYER-KNOWLES INC.

SOCO WEST INC.

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

GARDNER DENVER INC.

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

CRANE CO.

JOHN CRANE INC.

WARREN PUMPS LLC

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION FKA THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY

SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES INC.

HII SAN DIEGO SHIPYARD INC. [DOE 3 AND 503]

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOLEY CRYSTAL GAYLE

Defendant Attorneys

CORDERY THEODORE THOMAS

KHARE VIIU

BAILEY BOBBIE R.

FOLEY PATRICK J.

JENKINS CHARLES WILLIAM

BRUNI CHRISTOPHER B.

DAVIS GEOFFREY MARC

PIETRYKOWSKI MICHAEL J.

WEGLARZ CLAIRE C.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (SIMMONS HANLY CONROY))

7/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (SIMMONS HANLY CONROY))

Request for Dismissal

5/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/14/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/14/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

5/19/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.

5/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.

5/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

4/22/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE DEMURRER TO PL...)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE DEMURRER TO PL...)

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF PATRICK J. FOLEY

4/21/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF PATRICK J. FOLEY

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4/21/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Opposition - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4/15/2021: Opposition - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL C. COOK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL C. COOK IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Opposition - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4/15/2021: Opposition - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SACHSE ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Status Conference ((Simmons Hanly Conroy)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (Simmons Hanly Conroy))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gardner Denver, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order Overruling Demurrer and Denying Motion to Strike Filed by Defendant Sachse Engineering Associates, INC.); Filed by Sachse Engineering Associates, Inc. [Doe 1 and Doe 501] (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Craig Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HII SAN DIEGO SHIPYARD INC. [DOE 3 AND 503] is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SID E. PARKER BOILER MFG CO. INC. DBA PARKER BOILER CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated is a litigant