This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2021 at 04:16:30 (UTC).

CRAIG QUINN,, AS TRUSTEE OF THE CRAIG & COLLEEN QUINN FAMILY TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 2000, ET AL. VS URBAN COMMONS 6TH AVE SEATTLE, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 CRAIG QUINN,, AS TRUSTEE OF THE CRAIG COLLEEN QUINN FAMILY TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 2000 filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against URBAN COMMONS 6TH AVE SEATTLE, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9915

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

QUINN CRAIG AS TRUSTEE OF THE CRAIG & COLLEEN QUINN FAMILY TRUST

CAPITAL LENDING RESOURCES INC.

Defendants

WU HOWARD

URBAN COMMONS 6TH AVE SEATTLE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WOODS TAYLOR

URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL JULIE Z.

Defendant Attorney

MCDERMOTT LISAMARIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/31/2020: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/12/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

1/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/4/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/19/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/19/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/19/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/19/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

3/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • Hearing09/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Hearing01/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Hearing12/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Hearing12/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Hearing12/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Legal Representation of Corporate Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance: (1) Case Management Conference and (2) Order to Show Cause re: Legal Representation of Corporate Defendants); Filed by Craig Quinn,, as Trustee of The Craig & Colleen Quinn Family Trust dated September 2000 (Plaintiff); Capital Lending Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Legal Representation of Corporate Defendants) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Legal Representation of Corporate Def...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Craig Quinn,, as Trustee of The Craig & Colleen Quinn Family Trust dated September 2000 (Plaintiff); Capital Lending Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Craig Quinn,, as Trustee of The Craig & Colleen Quinn Family Trust dated September 2000 (Plaintiff); Capital Lending Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Craig Quinn,, as Trustee of The Craig & Colleen Quinn Family Trust dated September 2000 (Plaintiff); Capital Lending Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Craig Quinn,, as Trustee of The Craig & Colleen Quinn Family Trust dated September 2000 (Plaintiff); Capital Lending Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Craig Quinn,, as Trustee of The Craig & Colleen Quinn Family Trust dated September 2000 (Plaintiff); Capital Lending Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Craig Quinn,, as Trustee of The Craig & Colleen Quinn Family Trust dated September 2000 (Plaintiff); Capital Lending Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Craig Quinn,, as Trustee of The Craig & Colleen Quinn Family Trust dated September 2000 (Plaintiff); Capital Lending Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Craig Quinn,, as Trustee of The Craig & Colleen Quinn Family Trust dated September 2000 (Plaintiff); Capital Lending Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STCV49915 Hearing Date: August 25, 2021 Dept: 54

\r\n\r\n

\r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n
\r\n

Superior Court\r\n of California

\r\n

County of Los\r\n Angeles

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n

Craig Quinn, et al.,

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n

\r\n

\r\n

Plaintiffs,

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n

Case No.:

\r\n

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n

20STCV49915

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n

vs.

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n

Tentative Ruling

\r\n

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n

Urban Commons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC, et al.,

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n

\r\n

\r\n

Defendants.

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n
\r\n

\r\n
\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Hearing Date: August 25, 2021

\r\n\r\n

Department 54, Judge Maurice A. Leiter

\r\n\r\n

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

\r\n\r\n

Moving Party: J.\r\nBrian Urtnowski, counsel of record for Defendants Urban Commons 6th Ave\r\nSeattle, LLC, Urban Commons, LLC, Howard Wu and Taylor Woods

\r\n\r\n

Responding Party:\r\nNone

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

T/R: THE MOTION IS GRANTED. COUNSEL TO FILE\r\nPROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON DEFENDANTS WITHIN 5 DAYS OF NOTICE OF RULING.\r\nCOUNSEL WILL BE RELIEVED UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

THE COURT SETS AN OSC RE: LEGAL REPRESENTATION OF CORPORATE\r\nDEFEDANTS FOR OCTOBER 26, 2021 AT 8:30 AM.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

COUNSEL TO NOTICE.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

If the parties wish to submit on the tentative, please email\r\nthe courtroom at¿SMCdept54@lacourt.org¿with notice to opposing counsel (or self-represented party)\r\nbefore 8:30 am on the day of the hearing.¿

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

The Court considers the moving papers. No\r\nopposition has been received.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

The Court may issue an order allowing an attorney to\r\nwithdraw from representation, after notice to the client. (CCP § 284.) \r\nThe attorney may withdraw from representation as long as the withdrawal\r\nwould not result in undue prejudice to the client’s interest—i.e., counsel\r\ncannot withdraw at a critical point in the litigation. (Ramirez\r\nv. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal. App. 4th 904, 915; see California Rule of\r\nProfessional Conduct 3-700.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

J. Brian Urtnowski, counsel of record for Defendants Urban\r\nCommons 6th Ave Seattle, LLC, Urban Commons, LLC, Howard Wu and Taylor Woods,\r\nseeks to withdraw from representation of Defendants. Counsel states there has\r\nbeen an irreconcilable breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. Trial is\r\nset for September 19, 2022 and no prejudice will result from counsel’s\r\nwithdrawal.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

The Court finds there is good cause for counsel’s\r\nwithdrawal. Counsel has complied with CRC 3.1362. The motion is GRANTED.

\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL LENDING RESOURCES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIMBALL JULIE Z.