Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2020 at 11:01:32 (UTC).

CRAIG NELSON, ET AL. VS SCOTT NORTHERN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 CRAIG NELSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SCOTT NORTHERN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8577

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NELSON STACY

NELSON CRAIG

Defendants

NORTHERN SCOTT

MIKE BROWN GRANDSTANDS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRERA NEIL JOAQUIN

Defendant Attorney

BERGSTEN ROBERT T.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/5/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/22/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/6/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/12/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/2/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Hearing08/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Hearing08/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Craig Nelson (Plaintiff); Stacy Nelson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Scott Northern (Defendant); Mike Brown Grandstands, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Craig Nelson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Craig Nelson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Craig Nelson (Plaintiff); Stacy Nelson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Craig Nelson (Plaintiff); Stacy Nelson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Craig Nelson (Plaintiff); Stacy Nelson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIKE BROWN GRANDSTANDS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J Ferrera