This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2022 at 09:24:08 (UTC).

CRAIG NAKAYAMA VS TESLA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 CRAIG NAKAYAMA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TESLA, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3909

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAKAYAMA CRAIG

Defendant

TESLA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NALBANDYAN A. JACOB

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/19/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10/19/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/4/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • Hearing02/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Craig Nakayama (Plaintiff); As to: Tesla, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/07/2022; Service Cost: 99.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Armen Tamzarian in Department 52 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Craig Nakayama (Plaintiff); As to: Tesla, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Craig Nakayama (Plaintiff); As to: Tesla, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Craig Nakayama (Plaintiff); As to: Tesla, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tesla Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NALBANDYAN A. JACOB