This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 05:08:51 (UTC).

C.R LAURENCE CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS GENIUS LABS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 C R LAURENCE CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against GENIUS LABS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON and GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9095

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

C.R LAURENCE CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GENIUS FUND I ABC LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SENIOR JOSEPH

GENIUS LABS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FULL CIRCLE LABS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SHINDER GARY

SENIOR JASON E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ARNOLD TODD MORRIS

GOLUBCHIK DAVID B

RAFFERTY PAUL

WILLIAMS IV JACK

Cross Defendant Attorney

HERICH EMIL WALTER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 09/24/2021

9/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 09/24/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/24/2021

9/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/24/2021

Case Management Statement

10/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

10/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; IDC))

10/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; IDC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; MOTION HEARING SETTING CONFER...)

11/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; MOTION HEARING SETTING CONFER...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; OSC RE MEDIATION SETTING; OSC...)

12/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; OSC RE MEDIATION SETTING; OSC...)

Answer

9/9/2021: Answer

Answer - ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

9/9/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT GARY I. SHINDERS NOTICE OF FILING REPLY TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

9/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT GARY I. SHINDERS NOTICE OF FILING REPLY TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Notice - NOTICE OF DEFENDANT/CROSS-PLAINTIFF GENIUS FUND I ABC, LLCS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GARY I. SHINDERS NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

9/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF DEFENDANT/CROSS-PLAINTIFF GENIUS FUND I ABC, LLCS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GARY I. SHINDERS NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

8/4/2021: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT GARY I. SHINDERS NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

8/31/2021: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT GARY I. SHINDERS NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/24/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

6/25/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

7/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Hearing09/07/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Hearing04/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Docketat 10:15 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose; OSC Re Mediation Setting; OSC Re Licensing Issues; Motion Hearing Setting Conference)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; OSC Re Mediation Setting; OSC...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose; Motion Hearing Setting Conference)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Motion Hearing Setting Confer...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose; IDC)) - Held - Advanced and Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by FULL CIRCLE LABS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant); GENIUS FUND I ABC, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by C.R LAURENCE CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GARY SHINDER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by FULL CIRCLE LABS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant); GENIUS FUND I ABC, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by C.R LAURENCE CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by C.R LAURENCE CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by C.R LAURENCE CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by C.R LAURENCE CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Genius Fund I, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Laurence Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERICH EMIL W.