This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2022 at 15:09:18 (UTC).

CPH HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP, P.C.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 CPH HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP, P C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0746

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHHP HOLDINGS II LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AKA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF HUNTINGTON PARK

CPH HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AKA COASTAL PLAZA HOSPITAL

ELADH L.P. A TEXAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AKA EAST LOS ANGELES DOCTORS HOSPITAL

GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP AKA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA

Defendant

HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAN ERIC D

Defendant Attorney

JONES DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/12/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

12/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

3/14/2022: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/7/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

2/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER

2/24/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER

Answer

1/31/2022: Answer

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/28/2021: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • Hearing07/11/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • Hearing07/11/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • Hearing02/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • Hearing02/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CPH Hospital Management, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff); Eladh, L.P., a Texas limited partnership (Plaintiff); Gardena Hospital, L.P., a Texas limited liability partnership (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CPH Hospital Management, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff); Eladh, L.P., a Texas limited partnership (Plaintiff); Gardena Hospital, L.P., a Texas limited liability partnership (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CPH Hospital Management, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff); Eladh, L.P., a Texas limited partnership (Plaintiff); Gardena Hospital, L.P., a Texas limited liability partnership (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CPH Hospital Management, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff); Eladh, L.P., a Texas limited partnership (Plaintiff); Gardena Hospital, L.P., a Texas limited liability partnership (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CPH Hospital Management, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff); Eladh, L.P., a Texas limited partnership (Plaintiff); Gardena Hospital, L.P., a Texas limited liability partnership (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CPH Hospital Management, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Plaintiff); Eladh, L.P., a Texas limited partnership (Plaintiff); Gardena Hospital, L.P., a Texas limited liability partnership (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CPH HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP A COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CHHP HOLDINGS II LLC DBA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF HUNTINGTON PARK is a litigant