Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 02:40:56 (UTC).

CP IV GLENDALE, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS CP CONSTRUCTION WEST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 CP IV GLENDALE, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CP CONSTRUCTION WEST, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1022

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CP IV GLENDALE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

A.R.S.S. FLOORING

EXCEL PLASTERING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CP CONSTRUCTION WEST INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRISTED ROSANNA E.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

5/12/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT)

3/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

1/13/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...)

2/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...) OF 02/05/2021

2/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ...) OF 02/05/2021

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/25/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/25/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (without prejudice entire action of all parties and all causes of action); Filed by CP IV GLENDALE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal pursuant to Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal pursuant to Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department D; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice Of Settlement Of Entire ...) of 02/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice Of Settlement Of Entire ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by CP IV GLENDALE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CP IV GLENDALE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CP IV GLENDALE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CP IV GLENDALE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXCEL PLASTERING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CP IV GLENDALE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CP CONSTRUCTIONS WEST, INC. is a litigant