This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 09:27:40 (UTC).

COYLE, MICHAEL - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 COYLE, MICHAEL - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHNSON, BARBARA R. and GREEN, LESLEY C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3920

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

GREEN, LESLEY C.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIEGEL JEFFREY

Decedent

COYLE MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PALMIERI RALPH V.

 

Court Documents

Bond - U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

6/9/2017: Bond - U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

5/5/2017: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Minute Order

6/5/2017: Minute Order

Proof of Publication

5/22/2017: Proof of Publication

Status Report of Personal Representative - Status Report of Personal Representative

8/21/2018: Status Report of Personal Representative - Status Report of Personal Representative

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

1/28/2019: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Notice - Hearing

1/24/2019: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

10/30/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/28/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/9/2018: Minute Order

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities

6/12/2017: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities

Minute Order

8/23/2018: Minute Order

Order - Order for Probate

6/19/2017: Order - Order for Probate

Letters (Initial)

6/21/2017: Letters (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

5/15/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • in Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Status Report Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Estate Administration Extended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • in Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Status Report Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • in Probate Department 11, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Status Report of Personal Representative (Status Report of Personal Representative ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2017
  • Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Duties and Liabilities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Bond (U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • in Probate Department 11, Green, Lesley C., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less