This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 01:28:33 (UTC).

COVINA VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC SCHOOL DISTRICT VS KYA SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 COVINA VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KYA SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0274

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

COVINA VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC SCHOOL DISTRICT

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

KYA SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

MCLOUGHLIN STEPHEN MATTHEW

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

STEC LAUREN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

8/16/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

8/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Ruling

6/7/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/26/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Cross-Complaint

5/20/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/20/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/3/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/2/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • Hearing07/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Reassignment); Filed by Covina Valley Unified School District, a California public school district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Covina Valley Unified School District, a California public school district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Covina Valley Unified School District, a California public school district (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Kya Services LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing); Filed by Covina Valley Unified School District, a California public school district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Covina Valley Unified School District, a California public school district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Covina Valley Unified School District, a California public school district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Covina Valley Unified School District, a California public school district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Covina Valley Unified School District, a California public school district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Covina Valley Unified School District, a California public school district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KYA SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where COVINA VALLEY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCLOUGHLIN STEPHEN MATTHEW