This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2022 at 14:17:11 (UTC).

COVARRUBIAS, MELISSA VS ESTACIO, ANDRES FELIPE

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 COVARRUBIAS, MELISSA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ESTACIO, ANDRES FELIPE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PELLMAN, AMY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2548

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PELLMAN, AMY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COVARRUBIAS MELISSA

Respondent

ESTACIO ANDRES FELIPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LEVINE KENZIE

LEVINE CHRISTIANA DANIELLE

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

11/3/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

11/3/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - UCCJEA

10/26/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Declaration - Income and Expense

10/26/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Summons

10/26/2021: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

10/26/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

10/26/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Publication - Denied

2/7/2022: Order - Publication - Denied

Application - Publication/Posting of Summons

2/2/2022: Application - Publication/Posting of Summons

Proposed Order - Publication

2/2/2022: Proposed Order - Publication

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Status Conference - FCCR 1

3/11/2022: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Case Status Conference - FCCR 1

Minute Order

4/19/2022: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2A, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Case Review Conference - Held - FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketOrder - Publication (Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketApplication - Publication/Posting of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE KENZIE