Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 07:19:01 (UTC).

COURTNEY TORRES VS HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 COURTNEY TORRES filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON and WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0103

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES COURTNEY

Defendant

HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAELS JONATHAN

Defendant Attorneys

ESQ. GARY WOLENSKY

ROTHENBERGER ANDREW JOSEPH

WOLENSKY GARY A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

4/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. ROTHENBERGER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. ROTHENBERGER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

4/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/28/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))]

1/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))]

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF HMA DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

1/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF HMA DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW ROTHENBERGER IN SUPPORT OF HMA MTS

1/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW ROTHENBERGER IN SUPPORT OF HMA MTS

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

1/14/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

1/14/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Case Management Statement

1/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE ...) OF 12/07/2020

12/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE ...) OF 12/07/2020

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANDREW ROTHENBERGER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICAS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

7/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANDREW ROTHENBERGER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICAS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

Motion to Transfer

7/8/2020: Motion to Transfer

Proof of Personal Service

6/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Courtney Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Andrew J. Rothenberger); Filed by Hyundai Motor America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions; Filed by Hyundai Motor America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Express Warranty (Count 4) and Implied Warranty of Merchantability (Count 5)); Filed by Courtney Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Courtney Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint); Filed by Hyundai Motor America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Andrew J. Rothenberger in Support of Defendant Hyundai Motor America's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Unverified First Amended Complaint); Filed by Hyundai Motor America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Courtney Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Courtney Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF ANDREW ROTHENBERGER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA?S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE); Filed by Hyundai Motor America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketMotion to Transfer; Filed by Hyundai Motor America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Courtney Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Courtney Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Courtney Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Courtney Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAELS JONATHAN A.