This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:08:24 (UTC).

COURTNEY GOETSCH VS ALEX A PARSI DDS

Case Summary

On 04/30/2018 a Other case was filed by COURTNEY GOETSCH against ALEX A PARSI DDS in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4528

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GOETSCH COURTNEY

Defendants and Respondents

PARSI ALEX A. DDS

DOES 1 TO 10

PARSI DDS ALEX A.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/18/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY

7/18/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/18/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

7/18/2018: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Notice

10/30/2018: Notice

Motion for Order

11/16/2018: Motion for Order

Motion for Order

11/16/2018: Motion for Order

Opposition

1/3/2019: Opposition

Reply

1/9/2019: Reply

Minute Order

1/16/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

1/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion for Order

2/25/2019: Motion for Order

Opposition

3/28/2019: Opposition

Minute Order

3/29/2019: Minute Order

Notice

4/2/2019: Notice

SUMMONS

4/30/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

4/30/2018: COMPLAINT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling Re Defendant Alex A. Parsi, D.D.S.' Motion for Terminating Sanctions); Filed by Alex A. Parsi, DDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Terminating Sanctions, Or I...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketOpposition (To Motion for Sanctions); Filed by Courtney Goetsch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketDefendant Alex Parsi, D.D.S.' Notice and Renewed Motion for Terminating Sanction or in the Alternative Monetary Sanctions; Declaration of Nicholas Aloia; Filed by Alex A. Parsi, DDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Alex A. Parsi, DDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Alex A. Parsi, DDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Alex A. Parsi, DDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Alex A. Parsi, DDS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Courtney Goetsch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704528    Hearing Date: January 08, 2020    Dept: 2

Goetsch v. Parsi

Defendant’s Four Motions to Compel Response to Request for Production of Documents, Set Two; Pre-Trial Special Interrogatories, Set Two; Supplemental Interrogatory and Supplemental Request for Production of Documents; Request for Sanctions are GRANTED.

Plaintiff, Courtney Goetsch, is ordered to provide verified responses without objection to Request for Production of Documents, Set Two; Pre-Trial Special Interrogatories, Set Two; Supplemental Interrogatory and Supplemental Request for Production of Documents within 20 days. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 2030.290, § 2031.300.

Defendant served the foregoing discovery on 7/17/19. Motions, Ex. A. Plaintiff admittedly did not provide timely responses Declaration of J. Scott Humphrey, ¶¶ 2, 5. While Plaintiff believes the information sought was given at the time of Plaintiff’s deposition, Plaintiff has the statutory to right to resort to depositions, interrogatories, and requests for production of documents. Coy v. Superior Court (1961) 58 Cal.2d 210, 218.

The fact that Plaintiff’s information may not have changed to warrant a substantive response to a supplemental interrogatory and document request does not relieve Plaintiff of the duty to provide a verified response to the supplemental discovery responses.

Imposition of sanctions against is warranted for the failure to respond to authorized methods of discovery, which is discovery abuse. Cal Code Civil Procedure §2023.010(d).

Accordingly, the court imposes total sanctions of $1260.00 for all four motions against Plaintiff Courtney Goetsch and her counsel J. Scott Humphrey.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC704528    Hearing Date: December 04, 2019    Dept: 2

BC704528 Goetsch v. Parsi

On the court’s own motion, the hearing on the Motions to Compel Discovery Responses and Production of Documents set for 12/4/19 is continued to 1/8/20 at 1:30 p.m. in Department SS-2. The due date for the opposition and reply is based on the original hearing date.