This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 01:05:37 (UTC).

COURTNEY DEAN VS ELI'S AUTO CENTER II, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 COURTNEY DEAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ELI'S AUTO CENTER II, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2979

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEAN COURTNEY

Defendants

ELI'S AUTO CENTER II INC.

ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY INC.

SHAMAM DANIEL

ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF WEST LOS ANGELES INC.

ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR I INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOULLOUKIAN NAZO

Defendant Attorney

MEPPEN DEBRA ELLWOOD

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NAZO KOULLOUKIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON ENTIRE ACTION

3/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NAZO KOULLOUKIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON ENTIRE ACTION

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION ALONG WITH COURT ORDER

3/9/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION ALONG WITH COURT ORDER

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

9/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/9/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/30/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Answer

9/4/2020: Answer

Initial Status Conference Order

5/15/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

7/22/2020: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

7/23/2020: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/23/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/23/2020

6/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

5/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 05/15/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

5/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 05/15/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Courtney Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Nazo Koulloukian in support of Plaintiff's request for dismissal on entire action; Filed by Courtney Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (of Entire Action along with court order); Filed by Courtney Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docketat 11:15 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Newly Filed Class Action) of 05/15/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Filed Class Action)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Courtney Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Courtney Dean (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR I INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEPPEN DEBRA ELLWOOD