This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2020 at 20:36:46 (UTC).

COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICT NO. 2 OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY, A SPECIAL DISTRICT VS GISG GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICT NO 2 OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY, A SPECIAL DISTRICT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GISG GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0922

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICT NO. 2 OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY A SPECIAL DISTRICT

Defendant

GISG GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISSMAN MADELINE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments

2/18/2020: Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER FOR JUDGMENT

3/4/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER FOR JUDGMENT

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1-25 ONLY

3/5/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DOES 1-25 ONLY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION;)

3/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION;) OF 03/05/2020

3/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION;) OF 03/05/2020

Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT

3/5/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

3/27/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/30/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

3/30/2020: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/5/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by County Sanitation District No. 2 of Los Angeles County, a special district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by County Sanitation District No. 2 of Los Angeles County, a special district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by County Sanitation District No. 2 of Los Angeles County, a special district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Judgment); Filed by County Sanitation District No. 2 of Los Angeles County, a special district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order REGARDING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION;) of 03/05/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order REGARDING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without Prejudice as to Does 1-25 ONLY); Filed by County Sanitation District No. 2 of Los Angeles County, a special district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (For Judgment); Filed by County Sanitation District No. 2 of Los Angeles County, a special district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by County Sanitation District No. 2 of Los Angeles County, a special district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by County Sanitation District No. 2 of Los Angeles County, a special district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by County Sanitation District No. 2 of Los Angeles County, a special district (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less