This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 17:13:21 (UTC).

COUNTY RECORDS RESEARCH, INC. VS MURIEL JONES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 COUNTY RECORDS RESEARCH, INC filed an Other lawsuit against MURIEL JONES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3262

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY RECORDS RESEARCH INC.

Defendants

JONES MURIEL

BENNETT DOARIAN

PARKER JAMAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARD JOHN PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/7/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/8/2022: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT DOARIAN BENNETT; AND FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING APPEARANCE OF DOARIAN BENNETT.

2/2/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT DOARIAN BENNETT; AND FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING APPEARANCE OF DOARIAN BENNETT.

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN P. WARD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE INTERPLEADER OF FUNDS, DISCHARGE OF LIABILITY AND RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

2/3/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN P. WARD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE INTERPLEADER OF FUNDS, DISCHARGE OF LIABILITY AND RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

Motion re: - MOTION RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO FILE INTERPLEADER OF FUNDS, DISCHARGE OF LIABILITY AND RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; PROOF OF SERVIC

2/3/2022: Motion re: - MOTION RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO FILE INTERPLEADER OF FUNDS, DISCHARGE OF LIABILITY AND RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; PROOF OF SERVIC

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD DENNIS ) PHELAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ) FILE INTERPLEADER OF FUNDS, ) UISCHARGE OF LIABILITY AND ) RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES AND ) COSTS

2/3/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD DENNIS ) PHELAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ) FILE INTERPLEADER OF FUNDS, ) UISCHARGE OF LIABILITY AND ) RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES AND ) COSTS

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

6/28/2021: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/28/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

7/1/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • Hearing08/05/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other FILE INTERPLEADER OF FUNDS, DISCHARGE OF LIABILITY AND RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Hearing08/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Doarian Bennett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketMotion re: (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO FILE INTERPLEADER OF FUNDS, DISCHARGE OF LIABILITY AND RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION AND SUPPORTING PAPERS); Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JOHN P. WARD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE INTERPLEADER OF FUNDS, DISCHARGE OF LIABILITY AND RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS); Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF RICHARD DENNIS ) PHELAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ) FILE INTERPLEADER OF FUNDS, ) UISCHARGE OF LIABILITY AND ) RECOVERY OF ATTORNEY FEES AND ) COSTS); Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT DOARIAN BENNETT; AND FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING APPEARANCE OF DOARIAN BENNETT.); Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Due Diligence); Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Due Diligence); Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by County Records Research, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY RECORDS RESEARCH INC. is a litigant