This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2021 at 12:10:46 (UTC).

COUNTY OF VENTURA VS CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER LC106902, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 COUNTY OF VENTURA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER LC106902. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5531

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF VENTURA

Defendants

THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER LC106902

MUNICH REINSURANCE AMERICA INC.

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

POMERANCE DREW E.

SALSIG RYAN R.

Defendant Attorneys

ROSENBERG SHERYL M.

SULLIVAN SUSAN KOEHLER

PETERSON MARK D.

LOVELL MATTHEW C.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

6/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER TO THE COUNTY OF VENTURAS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/25/2021: Answer - ANSWER LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER TO THE COUNTY OF VENTURAS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

6/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/29/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Statement

6/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/17/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER LC106902S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/27/2021: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER LC106902S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Case Management Statement

4/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Related Case

3/4/2021: Notice of Related Case

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO GRANT LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

3/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO GRANT LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Hearing01/13/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Hearing12/03/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by County of Ventura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by County of Ventura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Lexington Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Reassignment of Judicial Officer and Change of Hearing Location); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate (Re: Disqualification of Judge); Filed by County of Ventura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons); Filed by County of Ventura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case (and Mandatory Appearance); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by County of Ventura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Incoming Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketTransfer In Case Documents (Register of Actions Notice); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by County of Ventura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by County of Ventura (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Munich Reinsurance America, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER B1180D190825/1197JK is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Indemnity Company is a litigant